VA HJR69 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
2016 Virginia's Working Waterfront Master Plan. Supporting the 2016 Virginia's Working Waterfront Master Plan.
Title
2016 Virginia's Working Waterfront Master Plan; supporting Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104234D |