VA SB1 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from the current rate of $12.00 per hour to $13.50 per hour effective January 1, 2025, and to $15.00 per hour effective January 1, 2026. The bill satisfies a reenactment clause included in Chapters 1204 and 1242 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020.
Title
Minimum wage; increases wage to $13.50 per hour effective January 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] |
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] | Sen. Saddam Salim [D] | Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Requires 2/3 members present |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House (51-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 6-N) |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101024D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto