VA SB106 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Building Revitalization Grant Fund. Establishes the Building Revitalization Grant Fund administered by the Department of Housing and Community Development to award grants of up to $100,000 to businesses that make a capital investment of $1 million in revitalizing or retrofitting existing buildings in the Commonwealth to serve as a new place of business. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
Building Revitalization Grant Fund; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day in General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day in General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100646D |