VA SB113 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Veterans Services; Veteran's Fellowship for State Government Pilot Program. Creates, within the Department of Veterans Services, the Veteran's Fellowship for State Government Pilot Program (the Program) through which the Department shall collaborate with Virginia Commonwealth University to recruit veterans to participate in undergraduate-level and graduate-level cohorts to assist such veterans in pursuing educational pathways to employment with the Commonwealth. The Department shall report annually to the General Assembly by November 1 regarding the progress of the participants, the return on investment for the Commonwealth, and recommendations for Program enhancements. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2027.
Title
Veterans' Fellowship for State Government Pilot Program; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102009D |
Same As/Similar To
SB113 (Carry Over) 2024-02-12 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
HB141 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N)
HB141 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N)