VA SB127 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public school staffing ratios; school counselors; specialized student support positions. Decreases from one to 325 to one to 250 the ratio of full-time equivalent school counselors required to be employed by each local school board per student enrolled in the local school division. The bill also increases the number of specialized student support positions required to be employed by each local school board from at least three to at least four such positions per 1,000 students in the local school division. Such specialized student support positions include school social workers, school psychologists, school nurses, licensed behavior analysts, licensed assistant behavior analysts, and other licensed health and behavioral positions.
Title
School counselors; public school staffing ratios, increases specialized student support positions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102209D |