VA SB14 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Additional local sales and use tax to support schools; referendum. Authorizes all counties and cities to impose an additional local sales and use tax at a rate not to exceed one percent with the revenue used only for capital projects for the construction or renovation of schools if such levy is approved in a voter referendum. The bill removes the requirement that such a tax must have an expiration date on either (i) the date of the repayment of any bonds or loans used for such capital projects or (ii) a date chosen by the governing body. Under current law, only Charlotte, Gloucester, Halifax, Henry, Mecklenburg, Northampton, Patrick, and Pittsylvania Counties and the City of Danville are authorized to impose such a tax.
Title
Sales and use tax, local; additional tax authorized in counties & cities to support schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form rejected (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 28-N) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 28-N) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Requires 2/3 members present |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed in enrolled form rejected (25-Y 15-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB14ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title replaced 24108106D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 28-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (68-Y 28-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB14H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108106D-H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108106D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24100982D-E |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB14E |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Deeds agreed to |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N) |
2023-11-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-11-25 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100982D |
Same As/Similar To
HB458 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
HB600 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
HB805 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
HB600 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
HB805 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 605.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 606.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |