VA SB15 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reproductive health care services; prohibitions on extradition for certain crimes. Provides that no demand for extradition of a person charged with a criminal violation of law of another state shall be recognized by the Governor if such alleged violation involves the receipt or provision of or assistance with reproductive health care services within the Commonwealth unless the alleged criminal violation would also constitute a criminal offense under the laws of the Commonwealth. The bill also provides that such limit on extradition shall not apply when the person who is subject to such demand for extradition by another state was physically present in the demanding state at the time of the commission of the alleged offense and thereafter fled from such state. Reproductive health care services; prohibitions on extradition for certain crimes. Provides that no demand for extradition of a person charged with a criminal violation of law of another state shall be recognized by the Governor if such alleged violation involves the receipt or provision of or assistance with reproductive health care services within the Commonwealth unless the alleged criminal violation would also constitute a criminal offense under the laws of the Commonwealth. The bill also provides that such limit on extradition shall not apply when the person who is subject to such demand for extradition by another state was physically present in the demanding state at the time of the commission of the alleged offense and thereafter fled from such state.
Title
Reproductive health care services; prohibitions on extradition for certain criminal violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Requires 2/3 members present |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB15ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | House receded from substitute (51-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute (54-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB15H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107789D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107789D-H1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24100481D-E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB15E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100481D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1493 (Similar To) 2024-02-09 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice