VA SB241 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; notice of right to dispute claim. Requires that when an employee's workers' compensation claim is denied, an employer or insurer shall include in its letter denying benefits a notice that the employee has a right to dispute the claim denial through the Virginia Workers' Compensation Commission.
Title
Workers' compensation; notice of right to dispute claim.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 27-N) (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 584 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB241ER) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (70-Y 27-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed House (70-Y 27-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (17-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100990D |