VA SB250 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; remote ultrasound procedures; remote fetal non-stress tests. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to modify the state plan for medical assistance services to include a provision allowing for payment under certain conditions for remote ultrasound procedures and remote fetal non-stress tests. Department of Medical Assistance Services; remote ultrasound procedures; remote fetal non-stress tests. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to modify the state plan for medical assistance services to include a provision allowing for payment under certain conditions for remote ultrasound procedures and remote fetal non-stress tests.
Title
Remote ultrasound procedures and fetal non-stress tests; DMAS to modify state plan for assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 585 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB250ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Assigned sub: Social Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24101640D-E |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB250E |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101640D |