VA SB252 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; state and local employees. Requires the state health plan to provide means for coverage of one additional adult. The total cost for such additional adult must be paid for by the state employee. The bill also expands the list of people who may be provided certain types of insurance by a locality, adding the dependents of officers and employees of a locality, as well as the dependents of those employed by commissions and other entities controlled by or working closely with a locality, to the list of people to whom a locality may provide accident and health insurance. The bill expands the potential eligibility for health insurance programs to include the dependents of eligible members of volunteer fire or rescue companies and the dependents of retired officers and employees. The bill requires any locality providing insurance to dependents of employees to provide the same programs to dependents of constitutional officers in some cases.
Title
Insurance; state health care plan to provide that coverage of 1 additional adult may be purchased.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB252S1 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104755D-S1 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104755D-S1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 5-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101958D |