VA SB252 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Forester; century forest program. Directs the State Forester to establish a program to honor families whose property has been in the same family for 100 years or more, includes at least 20 contiguous acres of managed forest, and meets certain requirements. The bill also removes the option for the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to recognize under the century farm program a farm that does not gross more than $2,500 annually but is being used for a bona fide silvicultural purpose.
Title
Century forest program; State Forester to establish program to honor certain families, eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006) | |
2016-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 23, 2016 | |
2016-02-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/16/16 |
2016-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB252ER) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16100660D-E |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB252E |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100660D |