VA SB275 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advance medical directives. Clarifies authority of an advance directive in cases in which a person is subject to an emergency custody, temporary detention, involuntary admission, or mandatory outpatient treatment order; eliminates the requirement that a second physician or licensed clinical psychologist provide a written certification that a patient is incapable of making an informed decision in cases in which the patient is unconscious or experiencing a profound impairment of conscious function due to trauma, stroke, or other acute physiological condition; adds a provision authorizing a person who has exhibited special care and concern for a patient and is familiar with the patient's beliefs and values to make health care decisions on that patient's behalf if the patient is incapable of making an informed decision, except in cases in which the proposed treatment involves the withholding or withdrawing of a life-prolonging procedure; and clarifies the procedure regarding decisions made over a patient's protest. This bill also provides that a public guardian may authorize admission of an incapacitated person to a mental health facility in certain situations.
Title
Advance medical directives; clarifies authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB275ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB275ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Title replaced 10105612D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB275H1 | |
2010-03-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105612D-H1 | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105612D-H1 | |
2010-02-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100376D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 713 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2982 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2983.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2983.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2984 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2986 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2986.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2987.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2988 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |