VA SB322 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance requirements for motor carriers. Provides that the existing exemption of motor carriers from the laws in Chapter 21 of Title 46.2 for the transportation of property (i) between any point in Virginia and any point outside Virginia and (ii) between points within any city or town does not apply to the chapter's insurance requirements.
Title
Motor carriers; insurance requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638) | |
2012-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB322ER) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102839D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2143 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2143.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |