VA SB322 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of The Plains; elections; election dates and terms. Changes elections and terms for town councilmen and the mayor to reflect a change for elections from May to November and changes the beginning of terms from July following the elections to January.
Title
The Plains, Town of; amending charter, election dates and terms of offices.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 335 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB322ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101525D |