VA SB330 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; real estate board; continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and salespersons. Increases from eight to 11 the number of hours of continuing education an applicant for relicensure as a real estate broker or salesperson shall complete in the topics of ethics and standards of conduct, fair housing, legal updates and emerging trends, real estate agency, and real estate contracts. The bill also decreases from eight to five the number of hours of general elective courses such applicants shall complete. The bill directs the Real Estate Board to adopt regulations to implement the provisions of the bill against current licensees beginning in such licensee's next full renewal cycle following the effective date of such regulations.
Title
Real estate board; continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and salespersons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120) | |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 120 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB330ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104938D |
Same As/Similar To
HB383 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)