VA SB336 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Photo speed monitoring devices; high-risk intersection segments. Permits a state or local law-enforcement agency to place and operate a photo speed monitoring device at a high-risk intersection segment, defined in the bill, located within the locality for the purpose of recording violations resulting from the operation of a vehicle in excess of the speed limit, provided that such law-enforcement agency certifies that a traffic fatality has occurred since January 1, 2014, in such segment. The bill provides the same requirements for such devices, information collected from such devices, and any enforcement actions resulting from information collected from such devices as current law applies to the use of such devices in school crossing zones and highway work zones. Photo speed monitoring devices; high-risk intersection segments. Permits a state or local law-enforcement agency to place and operate a photo speed monitoring device at a high-risk intersection segment, defined in the bill, located within the locality for the purpose of recording violations resulting from the operation of a vehicle in excess of the speed limit, provided that such law-enforcement agency certifies that a traffic fatality has occurred since January 1, 2014, in such segment. The bill provides the same requirements for such devices, information collected from such devices, and any enforcement actions resulting from information collected from such devices as current law applies to the use of such devices in school crossing zones and highway work zones.
Title
Photo speed monitoring devices; high-risk intersection segments.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 670 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB336ER) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Title replaced 24107913D-H1 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute (73-Y 26-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB336H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107913D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107913D-H1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Innovations (Ad Hoc) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105033D |