VA SB373 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Off-road recreational vehicles. Authorizes localities embraced by the Southwest Regional Recreation Authority to allow over-the-road operation of "off-road recreational vehicles" within their boundaries.
Title
Off-road recreational vehicles; localities to allow on certain highways within their boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB373ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed House with amendment (89-Y 9-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-03-01 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (17-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB373S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105110D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105110D-S1 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102689D |
Same As/Similar To
HB849 (Same As) 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)