VA SB398 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protective orders; respondent to notify court of change of address. Requires the respondent against whom a protective order has been issued to notify the court in writing within seven days of any change of residence while such order is in effect, provided that such order has been properly served upon the respondent. In a proceeding involving a preliminary protective order, the bill provides that the court may require the respondent to notify the court in writing within seven days of any change of residence while such preliminary protective order is in effect. The bill also provides that any failure of a respondent to make such required notification shall be punishable by contempt. Protective orders; respondent to notify court of change of address. Requires the respondent against whom a protective order has been issued to notify the court in writing within seven days of any change of residence while such order is in effect, provided that such order has been properly served upon the respondent. In a proceeding involving a preliminary protective order, the bill provides that the court may require the respondent to notify the court in writing within seven days of any change of residence while such preliminary protective order is in effect. The bill also provides that any failure of a respondent to make such required notification shall be punishable by contempt.
Title
Protective orders; respondent to notify court of change of address.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 594 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB398ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substituteSB398S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107453D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Substitute bill reprinted 24107453D-S1 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107453D-S1 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104772D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 279.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |