VA SB437 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military medical personnel; pilot program. Directs the Department of Veterans Services, in collaboration with the Department of Health Professions, to establish a pilot program in which military medical personnel may practice and perform certain delegated acts that constitute the practice of medicine under the supervision of a licensed physician or podiatrist. The bill requires the Department of Veterans Services to establish general requirements for participating in the program.
Title
Military medical personnel; pilot program for personnel to practice medicine.
Sponsors
Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] |
Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2016 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB437ER) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB437S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104837D-S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB622 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104837D-S1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101363D |
Same As/Similar To
HB825 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0418)
HB825 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0418)
HB825 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0418)