VA SB467 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Smoking; prohibition on the grounds of public elementary, intermediate, and secondary schools. Expands the prohibition on smoking in the interior of public elementary, intermediate, and secondary schools to include the grounds of such schools. The bill also prohibits smoking in the interior of any public school administration building.
Title
Smoking; prohibition on public school grounds and public school administration building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2012-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12103160D-E | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB467E | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103160D |