VA SB467 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0442)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0442)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child day programs; exemptions from licensure. Exempts from licensure any child day program that is (i) an instructional program offered by a public school that serves preschool-age children or that satisfies compulsory attendance laws or the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act, as amended, or (ii) a program of school-sponsored extracurricular activities that is focused on single interests such as, but not limited to, music, sports, drama, civic service, or foreign language. The bill also removes the directive that any education and care programs provided by public schools that are not exempt from licensure be regulated by the State Board of Education using regulations that incorporate, but may exceed, the regulations for child day centers licensed by the Department of Social Services.
Title
Child day programs; exemptions from licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0442) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0442) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 442 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB467ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB467S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105223D-S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105223D-S1 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100972D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |