VA SB467 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human trafficking training for law-enforcement personnel. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish training standards for law-enforcement personnel regarding the recognition, prevention, and reporting of human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking; training for law-enforcement personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 46 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB467ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102983D |
Same As/Similar To
HB283 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
HB283 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
HB283 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)