VA SB48 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vacant buildings; registration. Permits any county, city, or town to require, by ordinance, the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and (i) that meets the definition of "derelict building" in relevant law, (ii) that meets the definition of "criminal blight" in relevant law, or (iii) in which a locality has determined a person is living without the authority of the owner to register such building annually. Under current law, any city and certain towns are permitted to require the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and meets the definition of "derelict building" in relevant law to register such building annually.
Title
Vacant buildings; registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 616 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB48ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (65-Y 35-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB48S1 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24105512D-S1 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Incorporates SB478 (Aird) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24105512D-S1 |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100196D |
Same As/Similar To
HB476 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
HB1486 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
HB1486 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)