VA SB494 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reduced cigarette ignition propensity; penalties. Transfers administration of the reduced cigarette ignition propensity (RCIP) program from the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to the Executive Director of the Department of Fire Programs. The RCIP program, enacted in 2008, restricted the manufacture, sale, or offer for sale of cigarettes that do not meet a performance standard for fire safety. Manufacturers are assessed a fee of $250 per brand, the proceeds from which are to be deposited in the Cigarette Fire Safety Standard and Firefighter Protection Act Fund. Violators are subject to civil penalties.
Title
Reduced cigarette ignition propensity; penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 370 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB494ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14101404D-E |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB494E |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101404D |
Same As/Similar To
HB785 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 1003.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 293.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 293.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |