VA SB495 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
RPS eligible sources; falling water generation facilities. Provides that, notwithstanding contrary provisions of law, any falling water generation facility, as defined in the bill, located in the Commonwealth and commencing commercial operations prior to July 1, 2024, shall be considered a renewable energy portfolio standard eligible source.
Title
RPS eligible sources; falling water generation facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 596 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB495ER) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB495S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106521D-S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106521D-S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104452D |