VA SB51 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; dissemination and availability of online transition resources. Directs the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, in partnership with relevant entities, to ensure that online resources are readily available and disseminated to all individuals of age to transition from school to post-school activities and their families. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Disability Commission. Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; dissemination and availability of online transition resources. Directs the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, in partnership with relevant entities, to ensure that online resources are readily available and disseminated to all individuals of age to transition from school to post-school activities and their families. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Disability Commission.
Title
Online transition resources; DARS, et al., to ensure dissemination and availability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB51ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Assigned sub: Social Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24103243D-E |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB51E |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103243D |
Subjects
Aging and Rehabilitative Services Department for
Education
Persons with Disabilities
Uncodified Legislation
Education
Persons with Disabilities
Uncodified Legislation