VA SB517 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Tax exemptions; Confederacy organizations. Eliminates the exemption from state recordation taxes for the Virginia Division of the United Daughters of the Confederacy and eliminates the tax-exempt designation for real and personal property owned by the Virginia Division of the United Daughters of the Confederacy, the General Organization of the United Daughters of the Confederacy, the Confederate Memorial Literary Society, and the Stonewall Jackson Memorial, Incorporated.
Title
Tax exemptions; Confederacy organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 43-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 43-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 17, 2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB517ER) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 43-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House (52-Y 43-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from Finance (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24106161D-ES1 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB517ES1 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Williams Graves agreed to |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB517S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106161D-S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106161D-S1 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101833D |
Same As/Similar To
HB568 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor