VA SB534 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers; sale of franchise. Changes the deadline for a vehicle manufacturer, factory branch, distributor, or distributor branch to reject the sale or transfer of a dealership from 30 days prior to the effective date of the sale or transfer to 60 days from the receipt of notice from the dealer of the proposed sale or transfer and lists requirements for such notice from the dealer. The bill provides that an objection to a sale or transfer based on an applicant's years of motor dealer management experience is a reasonable objection but removes the right to object based on other applicant qualifications. The bill further provides that a franchisor's consent to a relocation of a business cannot be unreasonably withheld.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; sale of franchise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: BLOCK VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 791 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB534ER2) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | House | BLOCK VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB534ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB534S1 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106300D-S1 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106300D-S1 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101314D |
Same As/Similar To
HB191 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)