VA SB541 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0359)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0359)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Casino gaming; eligible host city. Removes the City of Richmond as an eligible host city for casino gaming establishments in the Commonwealth.
Title
Casino gaming; removes the City of Richmond as an eligible host city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0359) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 359 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB541ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103472D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1131 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)