VA SB557 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-23 - Continued to 2025 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-23 - Continued to 2025 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable energy portfolio standard; eligibility of hydrogen and nuclear resources. Provides that, for the purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard, eligible sources include (i) hydrogen resources that are produced from zero-carbon generating facilities located in the Commonwealth and (ii) zero-carbon nuclear generating facilities located in the Commonwealth that were placed into service after July 1, 2024.
Title
Renewable energy portfolio standard; eligibility of hydrogen and nuclear resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2025 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Senate | Continued to 2025 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102277D |
Same As/Similar To
SB557 (Carry Over) 2024-01-23 - Continued to 2025 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
HB1074 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Labor and Commerce
HB1074 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Labor and Commerce