VA SB56 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Persons not guilty by reason of insanity; court-appointed counsel fees. Increases from $25 to $75 the fee paid to court-appointed counsel representing a person in a civil commitment proceeding under Title 19.2 (Criminal Procedure). The bill also provides that court-appointed counsel representing a person who was acquitted of a felony by reason of insanity in a hearing to assess the need for inpatient hospitalization of the acquittee shall be paid a fee not to exceed $445 based on an hourly rate set by the Supreme Court of Virginia. The bill will not become effective unless an appropriation effectuating the purposes of the bill is included in the 2014 appropriation act. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Judicial Council.
Title
Persons not guilty by reason of insanity; court-appointed counsel fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14101223D-E |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB56E |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101223D |