VA SB56 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cutting of grass, weeds, and other foreign growth. Provides that in local grass cutting ordinances as applied to vacant developed property, foreign growth includes overgrown shrubs and trees.
Title
Grass, weeds, and other foreign growth; local cutting ordinances include overgrown shrubs and trees.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | House | Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16101344D-E |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB56E |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 1-N) |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101344D |