VA SB56 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Foster Care Prevention program. Establishes the Foster Care Prevention program to facilitate placements with relatives and ensure that such relatives are provided with the resources necessary to provide care for the child. The bill provides that a child is eligible to participate in the Foster Care Prevention program if the local department of social services (local department) determines that (i) the child is being cared for by a relative; (ii) the child's parent or guardian voluntarily placed the child with such relative after November 1, 2020; (iii) the child demonstrates a strong attachment to the relative, and the relative has a strong commitment to caring for the child; and (iv) the placement of the child with the relative was necessary to prevent or eliminate the need to place the child in foster care. The bill requires relatives seeking to receive Foster Care Prevention program payments to enter into an agreement with the local department and Department of Social Services that describes the manner in which payments will be provided and establishes the amount of such payments. Foster Care Prevention program. Establishes the Foster Care Prevention program to facilitate placements with relatives and ensure that such relatives are provided with the resources necessary to provide care for the child. The bill provides that a child is eligible to participate in the Foster Care Prevention program if the local department of social services (local department) determines that (i) the child is being cared for by a relative; (ii) the child's parent or guardian voluntarily placed the child with such relative after November 1, 2020; (iii) the child demonstrates a strong attachment to the relative, and the relative has a strong commitment to caring for the child; and (iv) the placement of the child with the relative was necessary to prevent or eliminate the need to place the child in foster care. The bill requires relatives seeking to receive Foster Care Prevention program payments to enter into an agreement with the local department and Department of Social Services that describes the manner in which payments will be provided and establishes the amount of such payments.
Title
Foster Care Prevention program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB56S2 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104687D-S2 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 22104414D-S1 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104687D-S2 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104414D-S1 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100669D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 278.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |