VA SB562 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefit plans; federal law changes. Authorizes health carriers to sell, issue, or offer for sale any health benefit plan that would otherwise not be permitted to be sold, issued, or offered for sale due to conflict with the requirements of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), to the extent that the requirements of the PPACA are amended by any federal law.
Title
Health benefit plans; sale, renewal, or offer of plans, special exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 271 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 8, 2016 | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/1/16 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB562ER) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB562S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Emergency clause deleted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104989D-S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104989D-S1 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 16102635D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3406.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3431 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3454.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3551 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |