VA SB610 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; slot-retention requests; Developmental Disability waivers; sunset. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to amend their regulations to allow for support coordinators to request and subsequently obtain approval of consecutive waiver slot-retention requests for a period of up to 365 calendar days for individuals who have been assigned a Developmental Disability waiver slot. Current regulations allow for four consecutive 30-day slot-retention extensions. The bill sunsets on June 30, 2026, and is identical to
Title
Slot-retention requests; Developmental Disability waiver slots, sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125) | |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 125 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB610ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24105008D-E |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB610E |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105008D |
Same As/Similar To
HB577 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)