VA SB618 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Bristol. Amends the City of Bristol's charter to provide for five voting precincts rather than four. The bill also replaces references to the personnel department with "human resources department" and makes changes related to the assignment of powers and duties.
Title
Bristol, City of; amending charter, increases voting precincts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB618ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101383D |
Same As/Similar To
HB682 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)