VA SB626 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Barrier crimes; adult substance abuse and mental health services; exception. Permits the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, providers of substance abuse or mental health services to adults, and community services boards and behavioral health authorities to hire applicants convicted of certain barrier crimes of misdemeanor assault and battery or involving controlled substances provided that such conviction occurred more than four years prior to the application date for employment.
Title
Barrier crimes; adult substance abuse and mental health services, exception.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Pillion [R] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Travis Hackworth [R] | Sen. Tammy Brankley Mulchi [R] | Sen. Aaron Rouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 683 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB626ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 2-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 24109038D-S1 |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-04 | House | Delegates: Price, Tran, Cherry |
2024-03-04 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senators: Pillion, Perry, Carroll Foy |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-28 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-27 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute (94-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB626H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107756D-H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107756D-H1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Assigned sub: Health Professions |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103351D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1269 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |