VA SB627 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education and Virginia Community College System; College and Career Ready Virginia Program and Fund established. Establishes the College and Career Ready Virginia Fund and requires the Department of Education and the Virginia Community College System to establish the College and Career Ready Virginia Program whereby each school board is required to offer each qualified high school student in the local school division access at the high school to the dual enrollment courses that are sufficient to complete the Passport Program and the Uniform Certificate of General Studies Program at a public institution of higher education at no cost to such students. The bill establishes several enumerated duties for the Department and the System in the administration of the College and Career Ready Virginia Program, including the establishment of a work group to make recommendations no later than November 1, 2024, on the incorporation of a career and technical education program of coursework into the College and Career Ready Virginia Program.
Title
College and Career Ready Virginia Program and Fund; established and created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB627ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 24108997D-S3 |
2024-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-01 | House | Delegates: Rasoul, Reaser, Coyner |
2024-03-01 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Aird, Suetterlein |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-27 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-26 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2024-02-22 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB627H1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107966D-H1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107966D-H1 |
2024-02-19 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB627S2 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107611D-S2 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 24107152D-S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107611D-S2 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107152D-S1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103037D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1087 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Subjects
Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 237.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 237.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3137 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 905.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |