VA SB628 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Casino gaming; eligible host cities. Amends the list of cities eligible to host a casino in the Commonwealth by replacing Richmond with Petersburg. The bill also provides that the governing body of any eligible host city that holds a local referendum on the question of whether casino gaming should be permitted in such city that subsequently fails shall be prohibited from holding another local referendum on the same question for a period of three years from the date of the last referendum. Casino gaming; eligible host cities. Amends the list of cities eligible to host a casino in the Commonwealth by replacing Richmond with Petersburg. The bill also provides that the governing body of any eligible host city that holds a local referendum on the question of whether casino gaming should be permitted in such city that subsequently fails shall be prohibited from holding another local referendum on the same question for a period of three years from the date of the last referendum.
Title
Casino gaming; eligible host cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 798 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB628ER2) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (80-Y 19-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (80-Y 19-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB628ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-07 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendment (78-Y 18-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-04 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2024-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB628S1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106958D-S1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106958D-S1 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Incorporates SB345 (Reeves) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101505D |