VA SB663 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; persons permitted to vote; identification requirements. Adds concealed handgun permits to the list of acceptable forms of identification to vote or when challenged.
Title
Voter identification requirements; concealed handgun permits as acceptable form of identification.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 723 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB663ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Passed House (86-Y 11-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12102154D |