VA SB663 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 604 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 604 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Veterinary Medicine; powers and duties; veterinary satellite offices. Requires the Board of Veterinary Medicine to regulate, inspect, and register all satellite offices where veterinary medicine is practiced. The bill directs the Board to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. Board of Veterinary Medicine; powers and duties; veterinary satellite offices. Requires the Board of Veterinary Medicine to regulate, inspect, and register all satellite offices where veterinary medicine is practiced. The bill directs the Board to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Veterinary Medicine, Board of; powers and duties, satellite offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 604 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB663ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24104369D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1306 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - VOTE:Defeated #2 (48-Y 50-N)