VA SB707 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public middle schools and high schools; student organizations; career and technical education organizations permitted. Permits each public middle school and high school to establish career and technical education student organizations, regardless of whether such school offers career and technical education courses.
Title
Public middle schools and high schools; career and technical education organizations permitted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB707ER) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24104546D |