VA SB722 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Incorporated by Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Incorporated by Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enterprise zones; renewal periods. Authorizes the Governor, upon the recommendation of the Director of the Department of Housing and Community Development, to renew enterprise zones for up to four five-year renewal periods for zones designated on or after July 1, 2005, and for up to two five-year renewal periods for zones designated before July 1, 2005. Under current law, zones designated on or after July 1, 2005, may be renewed for up to three such periods and zones designated before July 1, 2005, may be renew for up to one such period.
Title
Enterprise zones; renewal periods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Local Government (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Incorporated by Local Government |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24105261D |
Same As/Similar To
HB61 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)