VA SB75 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Community services board; attend all hearings. Requires that an employee of the community services board that prepared the preadmission screening report attend the involuntary commitment hearing. The bill provides that where in person attendance is not practicable, attendance may be by electronic means. Further it provides that where the hearing is held in the jurisdiction of another community services board, an employee of the community services board serving that jurisdiction may attend on behalf of the community services board that prepared the preadmission screening report. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Community services board; requires employee that prepared report to attend hearing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2007-12-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2007-12-26 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080740216 |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB75 |