VA SB788 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0401)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0401)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Grand larceny; threshold. Increases from $500 to $1,000 the threshold amount of money taken or value of goods or chattel taken at which the crime rises from petit larceny to grand larceny. The bill increases the threshold by the same amount for the classification of certain property crimes.
Title
Grand larceny; increases threshold amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0401) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 401 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB788ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103374D |
Same As/Similar To
HB995 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 108.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 145.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 152.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 162 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 182 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 187.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 188 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 197 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 81 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 97 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |