VA SB79 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire or rescue volunteers; mental health treatment; funding by locality. Allows any locality to fund the cost of participation in mental health treatment and counseling programs by a member of a volunteer fire or rescue company. A mental health program in which such volunteers are eligible to participate must be comparable to an employee assistance program offered to paid employees of the locality.
Title
Fire or rescue volunteers; mental health treatment, funding by locality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 207 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB79ER) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB79S1 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104529D-S1 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Incorporates SB134 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104529D-S1 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101918D |
Same As/Similar To
HB233 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0417)
SB134 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Incorporated by Local Government
SB134 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Incorporated by Local Government