VA SJR126 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ126ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ126ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Northern Virginia Transportation Commission.
Title
Commending the Northern Virginia Transportation Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ126ER) |
2024-02-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-23 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-02-23 | House | Received |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Presented 24107429D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR218 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ218ER)