VT H0171 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 29, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 29, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to adult protective services and emergency housing transition
Title
An act relating to adult protective services and emergency housing transition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 29, 2023 |
2023-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor on June 29, 2023 |
2023-06-20 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 23, 2023 |
2023-06-20 | House | Senate Message: House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2023-06-20 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2023-06-20 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2023-06-20 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2023-06-20 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Wood of Waterbury, Lanpher of Vergennes, and Kornheiser of Brattleboro |
2023-06-20 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2023-05-12 | House | Action Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2023-05-11 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2023-05-10 | House | Senate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2023-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as moved by Senator(s) Lyons, Gulick, and Williams |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Chittenden for Committee on Finance |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Gulick, and Williams |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-05-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Gulick, and Williams |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-03-22 | House | Read third time and passed |
2023-03-22 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2023-03-21 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services, as amended, agreed to |
2023-03-21 | House | Report of the Committee on Human Services amended as offered by Rep. Noyes of Wolcott |
2023-03-21 | House | Rep. Noyes of Wolcott reported for the Committee on Human Services |
2023-03-21 | House | Read second time |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-03-17 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |