VT S0221 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 24, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 24, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Providing Statutory Purposes For Tax Expenditures
Title
An Act Relating To Providing Statutory Purposes For Tax Expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 24, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 24, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 19, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-10 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2014-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-10 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-10 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Motion by Senator Galbraith that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment |
2014-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-10 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2014-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Greshin of Warren |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Galbraith |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2014-05-05 | House | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Read Third time |
2014-05-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-05-02 | House | Amendment of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to |
2014-05-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-05-02 | House | Rep. Condon of Colchester reported for the committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Ashe, text |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Finance |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2014-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |