WA HB1003 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning disciplinary actions against the health professions license of the subject of a department of social and health services' finding.
Title
Concerning disciplinary actions against the health professions license of the subject of a department of social and health services' finding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Effective date 1/1/2014. |
2013-05-01 | House | Chapter 86, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 5:30 PM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2013-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2013-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-08 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2013-12-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |